WI AJR47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To renumber and amend section 9m of article I; and to create section 9m (1) of article I, section 9m (4) of article I and section 9m (5) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: the rights of crime victims (first consideration).
Title
The rights of crime victims (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 8 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Barca, Crowley, Hesselbein, Kessler, Ohnstad, Sargent and Spreitzer |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Report adoption as amended of Assembly Joint Resolution 47 recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2017-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2017-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-10-31 | House | Representative Neylon withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-10-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Novak |
2017-10-19 | House | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor |
2017-09-20 | House | Representative R. Brooks added as a coauthor |
2017-09-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Novak and Goyke |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-09-05 | House | Representative Crowley added as a coauthor |
2017-09-05 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Novak and Crowley |
2017-06-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak |
2017-05-23 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-05-18 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-05-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr47 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AJR47.pdf |