WI AJR44 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing Asian American and Native Hawaiian/Pacific Islander (AANHPI) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
Title
Recognizing Asian American and Native Hawaiian/Pacific Islander (AANHPI) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023 |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-05-17 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2023-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to calendar of 5-17-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2023-05-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-05-12 | House | Introduced |