WI AJR27 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: Wisconsin children's outdoor heritage.
Title
Wisconsin children's outdoor heritage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Concurred in |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-10-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | House | Adopted |
2015-10-15 | House | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-15 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced |