WI AJR21 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 10 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention for proposing amendments relating to a balanced budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention for proposing amendments relating to a balanced budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Assembly: Adopted (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-10HouseReport correctly enrolled on 11-10-2017
2017-11-08HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2017-11-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-07SenateConcurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2017-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on the calendar of 11-7-2017 following Assembly Bill 165
2017-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth
2017-11-03SenatePlaced on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-06-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-06-20SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-06-15SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-06-14HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-06-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 54, Noes 41, Paired 2
2017-06-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2017-06-07HousePlaced on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-06-02HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-06-02HouseReport adoption as amended of Assembly Joint Resolution 21 recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2017-06-02HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2017-05-31HouseExecutive action taken
2017-05-01HouseRepresentative Jarchow withdrawn as a coauthor
2017-03-31HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl
2017-03-28HousePublic hearing held
2017-03-20HouseRead and referred to Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations
2017-03-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback