WI AJR2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: honoring the life and commemorating the career and accomplishments of Hank Aaron.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring the life and commemorating the career and accomplishments of Hank Aaron.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-22-2021
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-02-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-02-16SenateConcurred in
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-02-05SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-01-29SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2021-02-05SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-01-28SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-01-28HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-01-28HouseRepresentative S. Rodriguez added as a coauthor
2021-01-28HouseAdopted
2021-01-26HousePlaced on calendar 1-28-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-01-26HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback