WI AJR18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: proclaiming the month of March 2021 as American Red Cross Month throughout the state of Wisconsin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming the month of March 2021 as American Red Cross Month throughout the state of Wisconsin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-30-2021
2021-03-23HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23SenateConcurred in
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-19SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-03-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-03-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-16HouseAdopted
2021-03-11HousePlaced on calendar 3-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback