WI AJR14 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Report correctly enrolled on 4-11-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Report correctly enrolled on 4-11-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming March 2017 as women's history month.
Title
Proclaiming March 2017 as women's history month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-11-2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Concurred in |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-4-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-09 | House | Representatives Tusler and Billings added as coauthors |
2017-03-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2017-03-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |