WI AJR12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and commemorating the career and accomplishments of Rush Limbaugh.
Title
Honoring the life and commemorating the career and accomplishments of Rush Limbaugh.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-15 | House | Senator Stroebel added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-05 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr12 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AJR12.pdf |