WI AJR112 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the Port of Milwaukee as Grantee for Foreign-Trade Zone No. 41 and supporting the inclusion of nine additional Wisconsin counties in the zone.
Title
Honoring the Port of Milwaukee as Grantee for Foreign-Trade Zone No. 41 and supporting the inclusion of nine additional Wisconsin counties in the zone.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Concurred in |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Adopted |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2012-02-21 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-21 | House | Introduced |