WI AJR10 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-7-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-7-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: declaring March 2013 American Red Cross Month.
Title
Declaring March 2013 American Red Cross Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-7-2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Concurred in |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-02-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Placed on calendar 2-28-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced |