WI AB988 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (9) (pq) and 23.199 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a Mississippi River erosion control revolving loan program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a Mississippi River erosion control revolving loan program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Jodi Emerson [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2020-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab988 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB988.pdf |