WI AB986 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 106.30 (1); to amend 441.01 (7) (a) (intro.), 441.01 (7) (a) 1., 441.01 (7) (b), 441.08, 441.10 (6), 441.15 (3) (b) and 441.16 (3) (d); and to repeal and recreate 441.06 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: the nursing workforce survey, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Title
The nursing workforce survey, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Macco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab986 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB986.pdf |