WI AB981 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.52 (27), 165.755 (5), 302.46 (1) (d), 321.62 (2) (b), 345.23 (2) (d), 345.61, 757.05 (1) (d), 757.34, 800.11 (1) (i), 946.49 (2), 950.04 (1v) (qm), 967.02 (3), 969.001 (intro.), 969.001 (1), 969.01 (3), 969.02 (1), 969.02 (2), 969.02 (2m), 969.02 (6), 969.02 (7), 969.02 (7m), 969.02 (8), 969.03, 969.04, 969.05, 969.065, 969.07, 969.12, 969.13, 969.14 and 973.20 (9m); to renumber and amend 946.49 (1), 969.001 (2), 969.01 (1) and 969.01 (4); and to amend 16.846 (3), 29.03 (2) (d), 36.11 (1) (d), 83.016 (1), 103.60 (1), 114.09 (1) (b) 3., 114.105, 175.60 (3) (d), 175.60 (3) (d), 175.60 (9g) (a) 2., 175.60 (11) (a) 2. g., 175.60 (14) (am), 289.33 (3) (d), 301.03 (7m), 321.62 (2) (c), subchapter III (title) of chapter 345 [precedes 345.11], 345.11 (2), 345.20 (2) (b), 345.28 (5) (c) 2., 345.28 (7), 345.315 (1), 345.32, 345.36 (1), 348.22, 753.30 (3) (a) 1., 755.14 (2), 757.26, 757.69 (1) (b), 781.04 (1), 782.18, 782.23, 782.29, 782.36, 784.05, 800.05 (1), 808.075 (4) (g) 1., 808.075 (4) (g) 2., 809.31 (6), 895.34, 895.346, 895.446 (4), 911.01 (4) (c), 938.18 (8), 938.35 (1) (cm), 940.48 (3), 940.49, 943.245 (3m), 943.51 (3r), 946.87 (2) (am), 967.04 (1), 967.08 (1), 967.08 (3) (a), 968.075 (2m), chapter 969 (title), 969.01 (2) (a), 969.02 (title), 969.02 (3) (intro.), 969.02 (4m), 969.02 (5), 969.035 (5), 969.035 (7), 969.035 (8), 969.035 (10), 969.08 (title), 969.08 (1), 969.08 (2), 969.08 (5) (b) 3., 969.08 (5) (b) 4., 969.08 (8), 969.08 (9m), 969.09, 969.10, 969.11 (1), 969.11 (2), 970.02 (2), 970.03 (1), 970.03 (2), 971.14 (2) (am), 971.14 (2) (b), 971.14 (2) (d), 971.20 (9), 971.31 (6), 972.08 (2) and 973.15 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating monetary bail as a condition of release in criminal proceedings. (FE)
Title
Eliminating monetary bail as a condition of release in criminal proceedings. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab981 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB981.pdf |