WI AB977 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 40.51 (7) (b), 59.875 (2) (b), 62.623 (2), 66.0506, 66.0508, 66.0509 (1m), 73.03 (68), 111.70 (1) (cm), 111.70 (1) (fm), 111.70 (3) (a) 7m., 111.70 (3) (b) 6m., 111.70 (3g), 111.70 (4) (cg), 111.70 (4) (d) 3. b., 111.70 (4) (mb), 111.70 (4) (mbb), 111.71 (4m), 111.71 (5m), 111.81 (3n), 111.81 (9g), 111.825 (1) (g), 111.825 (6) (b), 111.83 (3) (b), 111.845, 111.91 (3), 111.91 (3q), 111.92 (3) (b), 111.93 (3) (b), 118.223, 118.245 and 120.12 (4m); to renumber 111.70 (7m) (a), 111.825 (6) (a) and 111.83 (3) (a); to renumber and amend 40.51 (7) (a), 59.875 (2) (a), 62.623 (1), 111.02 (7) (a), 111.115 (1), 111.17, 111.70 (4) (c) 1., 111.70 (4) (cm) 1., 111.815 (1) and 111.92 (3) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 111.70 (4) (d) 3. a. and c. and 111.93 (3) (intro.) and (a); to amend 7.33 (1) (c), 7.33 (4), 13.111 (2), 13.172 (1), 13.48 (13) (a), 13.62 (2), 13.94 (4) (a) 1., 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (b), 16.50 (3) (e), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.70 (2), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (4), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 19.82 (1), 19.85 (3), 19.86, 20.425 (1) (a), 20.425 (1) (i), 20.505 (1) (ks), 20.505 (1) (kz), 20.917 (3) (b), 20.921 (1) (a) 2., 20.923 (6) (intro.), 36.09 (1) (j), 40.02 (25) (b) 8., 40.05 (4) (ag) (intro.), 40.05 (4) (b), 40.05 (4) (bw), 40.05 (4g) (a) 4., 40.05 (5) (intro.), 40.05 (5) (b) 4., 40.05 (6) (a), 40.62 (2), 40.80 (3), 40.81 (3), 40.95 (1) (a) 2., 46.2895 (8) (a) 1., 71.26 (1) (be), 77.54 (9a) (a), 100.45 (1) (dm), 109.03 (1) (b), 111.02 (2), 111.02 (3), 111.02 (7) (b) 1., 111.05 (2), 111.06 (1) (d), 111.06 (2) (i), 111.115 (title), 111.70 (1) (a), 111.70 (1) (f), 111.70 (1) (j), 111.70 (1) (n), 111.70 (2), 111.70 (3) (a) 3., 111.70 (3) (a) 5., 111.70 (3) (a) 6., 111.70 (3) (a) 9., 111.70 (4) (c) (title), 111.70 (4) (c) 2., 111.70 (4) (c) 3. (intro.), 111.70 (4) (cm) (title), 111.70 (4) (cm) 2., 3. and 4., 111.70 (4) (cm) 8m., 111.70 (4) (d) 1., 111.70 (4) (d) 2. a., 111.70 (4) (L), 111.70 (4) (mc) (intro.) and 5., 111.70 (4) (mc) 6., 111.70 (4) (p), 111.70 (7m) (c) 1. a., 111.70 (8) (a), 111.71 (2), 111.77 (intro.), 111.77 (8) (a), 111.77 (9), 111.81 (1), 111.81 (9), 111.81 (12) (intro.), 111.81 (12m), 111.81 (16), 111.815 (2), 111.82, 111.825 (3), 111.825 (4), 111.825 (5), 111.83 (1), 111.83 (4), 111.83 (5) (d), (e) and (f), 111.84 (1) (b), 111.84 (1) (d), 111.84 (1) (f), 111.84 (2) (c), 111.84 (3), 111.85 (1), (2) and (4), 111.91 (1) (a), 111.91 (1) (b), 111.91 (1) (c), 111.91 (1) (cm), 111.91 (1) (d), 111.91 (2) (intro.), 111.91 (2) (fm), 111.91 (2) (gu), 111.92 (1) (a) 1., 118.42 (3) (a) 4., 118.42 (5), 119.04 (1), 120.12 (15), 120.18 (1) (gm), 230.01 (3), 230.03 (3), 230.046 (10) (a), 230.10 (1), 230.12 (3) (e) 1., 230.34 (1) (ar), 230.35 (1s), 230.35 (2d) (e), 230.35 (3) (e) 6., 230.88 (2) (b), 233.02 (8), 233.03 (7), 233.10 (2) (intro.), 281.75 (4) (b) 3., 285.59 (1) (b), 704.31 (3), 851.71 (4), 904.085 (2) (a) and 978.12 (1) (c); to repeal and recreate 40.05 (1) (b); and to create 16.705 (3), 19.42 (10) (s), 19.42 (13) (o), 46.284 (4) (m), 46.2898, 46.48 (9m), 49.825 (3) (b) 4., 49.826 (3) (b) 4., chapter 52, 70.11 (41s), 111.02 (6) (am), 111.02 (7) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 111.05 (5), 111.05 (6), 111.05 (7), 111.06 (1) (m), 111.115 (1) (a), 111.115 (2), 111.17 (2), 111.70 (1g), 111.70 (3) (a) 7., 111.70 (3) (b) 6., 111.70 (3m), 111.70 (3p), 111.70 (4) (c) 1g., 111.70 (4) (cm) 1g., 111.70 (4) (cm) 5., 111.70 (4) (cm) 6., 111.70 (4) (cm) 7., 111.70 (4) (cm) 7g., 111.70 (4) (cm) 7r., 111.70 (4) (cm) 8., 111.70 (4) (m), 111.70 (4) (mc) 3., 111.70 (4) (n), 111.70 (7), 111.70 (7m) (ag), 111.70 (7m) (b), 111.70 (7m) (c) 3., 111.70 (7m) (e), 111.71 (4), 111.71 (5), 111.80, 111.81 (3h), 111.81 (7) (g), 111.81 (9k), 111.815 (1) (b) 5., 111.825 (2g), 111.83 (5m), 111.905, 111.91 (1) (cg), 111.91 (1) (e), 111.91 (2) (fp), 111.91 (2c), 111.92 (2m), subchapter VI of chapter 111 [precedes 111.95], 118.22 (4), 118.23 (5) and 233.02 (1) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: collective bargaining for public employees, prohibiting employees other than public safety employees from bargaining collectively on insurance contributions and employee required contributions to retirement, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Collective bargaining for public employees, prohibiting employees other than public safety employees from bargaining collectively on insurance contributions and employee required contributions to retirement, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-13 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2018-02-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab977 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB977.pdf |