WI AB97 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.10335 of the statutes; Relating to: designating the Bart Starr Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the Bart Starr Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |