WI AB963 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Public hearing held
Pending: Joint Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.08 (1) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g) and 238.12 (1); and to create 20.835 (2) (cq), 71.07 (3ym), 71.28 (3ym), 77.54 (67) and 238.165 of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing certain tax benefits for a paper products manufacturer with facilities in the city of Neenah and village of Fox Crossing and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain tax benefits for a paper products manufacturer with facilities in the city of Neenah and village of Fox Crossing and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenatePublic hearing held
2018-11-12SenateWithdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
2018-11-12SenateRevived by the committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 93 (1), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-20SenateReferred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-15SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-15SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-03-09SenateLRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 37
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 34
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stuck, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Considine, Genrich, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Meyers, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Shankland, Subeck, Wachs and Zamarripa
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2018-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 1:39 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen
2018-02-20HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5
2018-02-20HouseExecutive action taken
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing held
2018-02-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-02-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-02-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback