WI AB962 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the University of Wisconsin-Madison and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2017-18 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the University of Wisconsin-Madison and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2017-18 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-02-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-02-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 1:38 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
2018-02-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback