WI AB960 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 940.20 (2r) and 940.20 (7); to amend 48.685 (2) (bb), 48.685 (5) (bm) 4., 48.686 (1) (c) 9., 48.686 (1) (c) 12., 48.686 (2) (bb), 50.065 (2) (bb), 103.88 (1) (d), 165.84 (7) (ab) 2., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 767.461 (4), 940.03, 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.08 (10) (b) and 973.123 (1); and to create 103.88 (1) (bd) and 940.204 of the statutes; Relating to: battery or threat to a health care provider or staff member of a health care facility and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery or threat to a health care provider or staff member of a health care facility and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2022-03-23 | House | Published 3-24-2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-23-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 209 |
2022-03-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-22-2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | LRB correction |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a coauthor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:16 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-11 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-02-10 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-09 | House | Representatives Kurtz and Oldenburg added as coauthors |
2022-02-08 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2022-02-08 | House | Senators Ballweg and Darling added as cosponsors |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced |