WI AB954 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0137 (1); to amend 66.0137 (3); and to create 66.0137 (1) (b) and 66.0137 (5) (c) of the statutes; relating to: requiring municipalities to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a fire fighter who dies, or has died, in the line of duty.
Title
Requiring municipalities to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a fire fighter who dies, or has died, in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Spencer Coggs [D] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Rep. Ann Hraychuck [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab954 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB954.pdf |