WI AB950 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.50 (2) and 346.50 (2a) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: disabled parking privileges on University of Wisconsin System campuses. (FE)
Title
Disabled parking privileges on University of Wisconsin System campuses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:12 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-03 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2022-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced |