WI AB95 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 125.27 (3) and 125.51 (5) (d) of the statutes; relating to: permits issued by the Department of Revenue for the retail sale of alcohol beverages. (FE)
Title
Permits issued by the Department of Revenue for the retail sale of alcohol beverages. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-06 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Rural Economic Development and Rural Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 5 |
2011-10-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rural Economic Development and Rural Affairs |
2011-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab95 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB95.pdf |