WI AB942 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.29 (1); to repeal and recreate 30.29 (3) (title); and to create 30.29 (1) (a), 30.29 (1) (c), 30.29 (3) (i) and 30.29 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: the operation of motor vehicles on the exposed beds of outlying waters to control Phragmites australis.
Title
The operation of motor vehicles on the exposed beds of outlying waters to control Phragmites australis.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. John Nygren [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. James Soletski [D] | Rep. John Townsend [R] | Rep. Karl Van Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-16 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-16 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-13 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-13 | Public hearing held | |
2010-04-09 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Soletski | |
2010-04-07 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-04-07 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab942 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB942.pdf |