WI AB941 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: a commercial driver recruitment program. (FE)
Title
A commercial driver recruitment program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic and Workforce Development |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2022-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Considine, Shelton, Emerson, Ohnstad, Snodgrass, Conley, Doyle, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Hesselbein, Baldeh, Pope, L. Myers, Hebl, B. Meyers, Hong, Anderson, Vining, Stubbs and Billings |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Special Committee on Trade and Supply Chain, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-08 | House | Representative Dallman added as a coauthor |
2022-02-03 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Special Committee on Trade and Supply Chain |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced |