WI AB928 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.20 (3) (a) and (bf) and 971.19 (2); and to create 943.20 (5) and (6) and 943.50 (6) and (7) of the statutes; Relating to: theft crimes and providing a penalty.
Title
Theft crimes and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2024-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Penterman |
2024-02-09 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2024-02-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-26 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Penterman |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |