WI AB925 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.835 (1) (zm) and 73.03 (78) of the statutes; Relating to: local grant writing and compliance assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Local grant writing and compliance assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-19 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |