WI AB925 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.875 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the duties of special voting deputies with regard to retirement homes that are part of a multiple-use facility. (FE)
Title
The duties of special voting deputies with regard to retirement homes that are part of a multiple-use facility. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 34 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Taylor and Kessler |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:22 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced |