WI AB921 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.866 (2) (t) and 20.867 (3) (x) of the statutes; and to affect 2023 Wisconsin Act 19, section 9104 (1) (i) 1. em. and es., 2023 Wisconsin Act 19, section 9104 (1) (i) 3. ed., eh., ep. and et., 2023 Wisconsin Act 19, section 9104 (1) (i) 4. fm. and fs. and 2023 Wisconsin Act 19, section 9104 (1) (i) 4g.; Relating to: amendments to the 2023-25 capital budget for University of Wisconsin System projects, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation.
Title
Amendments to the 2023-25 capital budget for University of Wisconsin System projects, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:39 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born |
2024-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-11 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2024-01-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced |