WI AB910 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.48 (1) (b), 16.48 (2), 108.02 (26) (c) 9., 108.02 (26) (c) 14., 108.062 (1) (c), 108.062 (2) (b), 108.062 (2) (e), 108.062 (4) (a) 2., 108.062 (19) (a), 108.062 (19) (b), 108.062 (20) and 108.19 (3); to renumber 108.04 (7) (h); to renumber and amend 16.48 (1) (a) (intro.), 16.48 (1) (a) 1., 2., 3., 4., 5. and 6., 108.062 (4) (a) 1. and 108.062 (19) (intro.); to amend 16.48 (3), 59.40 (4), 71.93 (8) (b) 1., 108.02 (2) (c), 108.02 (13) (c) 2. a., 108.02 (13) (k), 108.02 (14), 108.02 (15) (j) 5., 108.02 (15) (k) 5., 108.02 (17m), 108.02 (19), 108.04 (12) (b), 108.04 (16) (d) 1., 108.04 (18) (a), 108.04 (18) (b), 108.062 (2) (a), 108.062 (2) (c), 108.062 (2) (d), 108.062 (2) (h), 108.062 (2) (m), 108.062 (3), 108.062 (3r), 108.062 (4) (b), 108.062 (6) (b), 108.062 (15), 108.065 (1e) (intro.), 108.10 (intro.), 108.13 (4) (a) 2., 108.14 (8n) (a), 108.14 (8n) (e), 108.14 (26), 108.141 (1) (h), 108.141 (3g) (a) 3. b., 108.141 (7) (a), 108.141 (7) (b), 108.145, 108.15 (3) (d), 108.151 (2) (d), 108.151 (7) (c), 108.151 (7) (f), 108.152 (1) (d), 108.155 (2) (a) and (d), 108.16 (6m) (a), 108.16 (6w), 108.16 (6x), 108.16 (9) (a), 108.18 (3) (c), 108.22 (8e), 108.22 (10), 108.223 (2) (b), 108.23, 108.24 (3) (a) 3. a. and 108.24 (3) (a) 4.; and to create 16.48 (4), 71.93 (8) (b) 1. d., 108.02 (10e) (c), 108.02 (15) (k) 21., 108.065 (3m), 108.101 (5), 108.151 (7) (i) and 108.16 (6m) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 231 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | LRB correction |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced |