WI AB91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 971.368 of the statutes; Relating to: undesignated felonies.
Title
Undesignated felonies.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:02 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from joint review committee on Criminal Penalties and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties |
2017-05-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2017-04-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab91 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB91.pdf |