WI AB909 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.80 of the statutes; Relating to: requirements and prohibited practices for Internet service providers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Requirements and prohibited practices for Internet service providers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Energy and Utilities and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Energy and Utilities and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2018-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced |