WI AB906 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.03 (3) (b) 3., 302.11 (7) (am), 302.113 (9) (am), 302.114 (9) (am), 304.06 (3), 973.09 (3) (b), 973.09 (3) (bg) 1. and 973.09 (3) (bm) 2.; and to create 304.074 (4g) and 973.20 (1v) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting revocation of probation, extended supervision, or parole for failure to pay restitution or certain fees. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting revocation of probation, extended supervision, or parole for failure to pay restitution or certain fees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab906 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB906.pdf |