WI AB905 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 31.385 (2) (a) 2.; and to amend 31.385 (2) (a) 1. (intro.) and 31.385 (2) (ad) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: financial assistance limits for dam removal. (FE)
Title
Financial assistance limits for dam removal. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2022-02-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2022-02-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-02 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced |