WI AB903 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 106.27 (1) (b) 1. and 115.385 (1g) (e); and to create 115.28 (28), 115.385 (1) (e), 118.35 (3m) and 118.35 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: programs for gifted and talented pupils. (FE)
Title
Programs for gifted and talented pupils. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-31 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced |