WI AB903 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 167.21 of the statutes; relating to: safety standards for movable soccer goals, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
Safety standards for movable soccer goals, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Steve Hilgenberg [D] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Kelda Roys [D] |
Rep. Annette Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 390 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Senate amendment 1 concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2010-04-22 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach | |
2010-04-21 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-04-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 2 | |
2010-04-13 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-07 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection | |
2010-03-26 | Introduced |