WI AB902 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 227.51 (3); to amend 440.205, 440.22 (1), 440.22 (2), 448.02 (4), 448.02 (8) (a), 448.02 (9) (intro.), 448.675 (2) and 450.01 (24); and to create 227.51 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: wholesale distributors subject to Pharmacy Examining Board requirements and enforcement and disciplinary authority of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and attached boards and credentialing boards. (FE)
Title
Wholesale distributors subject to Pharmacy Examining Board requirements and enforcement and disciplinary authority of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and attached boards and credentialing boards. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 328 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-5-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:07 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced |