WI AB901 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.024 (2) (d); and to create 29.164 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: the transfer of wild turkey hunting authorizations. (FE)
Title
The transfer of wild turkey hunting authorizations. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:18 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab901 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB901.pdf |