WI AB901 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: aids to individuals and organizations related to the arts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Aids to individuals and organizations related to the arts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 377 |
2016-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2016-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 3 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Representatives Barca and Shankland added as coauthors |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 91, Noes 4 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:14 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced |