WI AB898 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.165 (1) (d) and 118.33 (1) (a) 1. b.; and to create 115.28 (55v), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (a) 10. and 121.02 (1) (L) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: required instruction in civics in the elementary and high school grades, high school graduation requirements, and private school educational program criteria. (FE)
Title
Required instruction in civics in the elementary and high school grades, high school graduation requirements, and private school educational program criteria. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 64, Noes 35 |
2024-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2024-02-20 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Snodgrass, Shelton and Joers |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-18 | House | Representative Green added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced |