WI AB898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 69.04 (1) (a) 1., 69.04 (2) (b), 69.05 (2), (3) and (3m), 69.06 (2), (3) and (5), 69.07 (2), 69.08 (6), 69.10 (1) (a), 69.11 (5) (a) 2. d., 69.14 (1) (a) 2. and 3., 69.14 (3) (b), 69.18 (1m) (a) 3., 69.22 (4) and 69.23; to renumber and amend 69.04 (1) (a) 2. and 69.14 (1) (a) 1.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 69.10 (1) (intro.) and (b); and to amend 40.71 (3) (a), 40.73 (3) (c), 48.195 (1), 48.385 (2), 48.43 (4), 48.432 (1) (am) 1., 48.433 (2), (3) (a) and (8) (a), 48.94 (title), (1) and (2) (intro.), 48.978 (3) (g) 2., 49.22 (7g) (a), 49.785 (1r) (b), 49.84 (2), 59.365 (1) (b) and (3) (a), 59.43 (1c) (b), 69.01 (1r), 69.01 (8), 69.01 (10), 69.01 (11), 69.01 (15) (b), 69.01 (16m), 69.01 (19), 69.01 (21), 69.01 (24), 69.01 (25) (intro.), 69.01 (26) (a), 69.01 (26) (c), 69.01 (27), 69.02 (1) (a), 69.03 (2), 69.03 (3), 69.03 (4), 69.03 (5), 69.03 (6), 69.03 (7), 69.03 (8), 69.03 (11), 69.03 (14), 69.03 (15), 69.035 (4), 69.04 (2) (a), 69.04 (2) (c), 69.04 (3) (a), 69.05 (4), 69.06 (1), 69.07 (1), 69.08 (1), 69.08 (2), 69.08 (3), 69.08 (5), 69.08 (7), 69.11 (3) (b) 1., 69.11 (3) (b) 2., 69.11 (3) (c) (intro.), 69.11 (3) (e) 1., 69.11 (4) (b), 69.11 (5) (b), 69.12 (1), 69.12 (2), 69.12 (3), 69.12 (4), 69.12 (5), 69.13 (intro.) and (1), 69.13 (2) (a), 69.13 (2) (b) 1., 69.13 (2) (b) 4., 69.13 (2) (b) 5., 69.14 (1) (b), 69.14 (1) (c) (intro.), 69.14 (1) (d), (e), (f), (g) and (h), 69.14 (2) (a), 69.14 (2) (b) 1. and 2. (intro.), 3. a., b. and d., 4. (intro.), 5., 6., 7. (intro.) and 8. (intro.) and a., 69.14 (3) (a) (intro.) and 6., 69.14 (3) (c), 69.145 (title), (1) (a), (b) and (c), (2) (a), (b) and (c), (3) and (4) (a) and (b) (intro.), 1. and 2., 69.15 (title), (1) (intro.) and (b), (2) (a) (intro.), 2., 5. and 6., (b), (c) and (d) 1. (intro.), a., c., d. and e., 2. and 3. and (e), (3) (a) (intro.), 1., 2., 3. and 4., (b) 1., 3. and 4. (intro.), (c) and (d), (3m) (a) 2. and 3. and (b), (4) (a) and (b), (4m) (a) 1. and (b), (5) and (6) (title), (a), (b) and (c), 69.16 (2), 69.17, 69.18 (1) (b) (intro.), 69.18 (1) (bm) (intro.), 69.18 (1) (c), 69.18 (1) (cm) 1. (intro.), 69.18 (1) (d), 69.18 (1m) (intro.), 69.18 (1m) (a) 5., 69.18 (1m) (b) 2., 69.18 (2) (a), (b), (d) 1. and 2., (e) and (f) 1. and 3. and (3) (a), 69.19, 69.20 (2) (a) (intro.) and 2. and (c), (3) (b) 4., (c) and (e) (intro.), 1. a. and b. and 2. and (4), 69.21 (1) (a) 1., 69.21 (1) (a) 2. (intro.), 69.21 (1) (a) 2. b., 69.21 (1) (a) 2. c., 69.21 (1) (b) 2., 69.21 (1) (b) 3., 69.21 (1) (b) 4., 69.21 (1) (b) 5., 69.21 (2) (a), 69.21 (3), 69.21 (4) (b), 69.22 (1) (c), 69.22 (1) (cm), 69.22 (1m), 69.22 (1q) (c), 69.22 (5) (a) 3., 69.22 (5) (b) 2., 69.24 (1) (b), 69.24 (1) (c), 69.24 (1) (d), 69.24 (1) (e), 69.24 (1) (h), 69.24 (2) (a), 69.24 (2) (b), 100.545 (1) (h) 2., 103.34 (3) (a) 3., 103.73 (1) (a), 103.76, 214.37 (4) (k) 2., 215.26 (8) (e) 2., 343.125 (2) (a) 2., 343.14 (2r), 343.50 (8) (c) 2., 445.13 (1m) (a), 445.13 (1m) (b), 711.05 (1) (b), 711.12 (7) (a), 765.002 (4), 765.09 (3) (b), 767.80 (6m), 767.803, 767.805 (5) (b), 767.805 (6) (c), 767.87 (1m) (intro.), 767.89 (2) (b) 1., 2. and 3., 770.07 (1) (d) 2., 770.10, 770.12 (3), 786.36 (2), 786.36 (2m) (a) and (b), 867.045 (1) (intro.), 867.046 (2) (intro.), 891.09 (1), 891.39 (3), 891.395, 895.4803, 938.385 (2), 948.11 (2) (c) and 979.01 (1) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: changes to vital records references and procedures.
Title
Changes to vital records references and procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 334 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-5-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:06 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2018-02-09 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2018-02-08 | House | LRB correction |
2018-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-01 | House | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced |