WI AB896 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 973.10 (2) (a) and (b); to renumber and amend 302.113 (9) (ag) and 973.10 (2) (intro.); to amend 302.113 (9) (am), 302.113 (9) (b), 302.113 (9) (c) and 808.075 (4) (g) 3.; and to create 302.113 (9) (ag) 1. and 302.113 (9) (am) 2. a. of the statutes; Relating to: length of time in confinement following revocation of extended supervision or probation for violating a condition. (FE)
Title
Length of time in confinement following revocation of extended supervision or probation for violating a condition. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Frederick Kessler [D] |
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Sen. Nikiya Harris Dodd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-04-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2014-03-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab896 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB896.pdf |