WI AB895 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.866 (1) (u); and to create 13.48 (20e), 20.866 (2) (zcv) and 20.867 (3) (cv) of the statutes; Relating to: construction of or improvements to indoor, athletic or aquatic athletic facilities, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Construction of or improvements to indoor, athletic or aquatic athletic facilities, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] |
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 65, Noes 34 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Krug |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:19 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced |