WI AB89 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grants for farm to school programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for farm to school programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 61 |
2015-04-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |