WI AB889 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 346.89 (4m); and to create 346.89 (4m) (a) 2. and 346.89 (4m) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: use of cellular telephones in school zones and providing a penalty.
Title
Use of cellular telephones in school zones and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-03 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-01-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2024-01-02 | House | Introduced |