WI AB885 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (1) (mu); and to create 29.063 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: chronic wasting disease sampling and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Chronic wasting disease sampling and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-03 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-01-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2024-01-02 | House | Introduced |