WI AB877 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 601.427; to amend 626.31 (1) (b); and to create 601.465 (1m) (d), 601.465 (2m) (e) to (i), 601.465 (3) (e), 610.80 and 645.31 (16) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosures to the commissioner of insurance and other changes to the insurance laws, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Disclosures to the commissioner of insurance and other changes to the insurance laws, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 313 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-5-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:01 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced |