WI AB876 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 196.378 (2) (a) 2. f.; to renumber and amend 196.378 (2) (bm) and 196.378 (3) (a) 1.; to amend 196.025 (1) (c) 1., 196.378 (1) (h) 1. g., 196.378 (1) (i), 196.378 (2) (a) 2. d., 196.378 (2) (a) 2. e., 196.378 (2) (b) (intro.), 196.378 (2) (b) 5., 196.378 (2) (c), 196.378 (2) (d) (intro.), 196.378 (2) (e) (intro.), 196.378 (2) (f) (intro.), 196.378 (2) (g) 2., 196.378 (3) (a) 1m., 196.378 (3) (b), 196.378 (3) (c), 196.378 (4m) (a), 196.491 (title), 196.491 (6) and 196.496 (1); and to create 196.378 (1) (ai), 196.378 (1) (ak), 196.378 (1) (df), 196.378 (1) (dh), 196.378 (2) (a) 2. g., h., i. and j., 196.378 (2) (am), 196.378 (2) (b) 1t., 196.378 (2) (bm) 2., 196.378 (3) (a) 1b., 196.378 (3) (a) 1f., 196.378 (3) (a) 1g., 196.379 and 196.491 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: renewable portfolio standards and credits; electricity derived from biofuels; electric utility purchases of renewable energy and customer-generated electricity; distributed generation rules; granting rule-making authority; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Renewable portfolio standards and credits; electricity derived from biofuels; electric utility purchases of renewable energy and customer-generated electricity; distributed generation rules; granting rule-making authority; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-04-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-20 | House | Representative Bernard Schaber added as a coauthor |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab876 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB876.pdf |