WI AB87 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.20 (8); and to create 973.20 (4c) of the statutes; Relating to: restitution upon conviction of vehicular homicide. (FE)
Title
Restitution upon conviction of vehicular homicide. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-26 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Donovan added as a coauthor |
2023-03-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |