WI AB87 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 16.754 (1) (a) and 16.754 (2); to amend 16.72 (2) (c), 16.754 (title), 16.754 (2) (title) and 16.754 (3) (intro.); and to create 16.754 (1) (am), 16.754 (2) (a), 16.754 (2m) and 66.0145 of the statutes; Relating to: state procurement of products and services from businesses located in this state and setting a goal for local government to purchase a certain percentage of products and services from businesses located in this state. (FE)
Title
State procurement of products and services from businesses located in this state and setting a goal for local government to purchase a certain percentage of products and services from businesses located in this state. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 61 |
2015-03-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |