WI AB87 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.1105 (4e) (a) 4. of the statutes; relating to: expanding the number of tax incremental financing districts that may be designated as distressed or severely distressed. (FE)
Title
Expanding the number of tax incremental financing districts that may be designated as distressed or severely distressed. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Murtha [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Rep. Roger Rivard [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-07-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to Calendar of 7-20-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2011-07-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2011-07-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-07-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-07-12 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kerkman |
2011-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2011-04-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab87 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB87.pdf |