WI AB865 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.47 (4) (b), 165.68 (1) (b), 165.68 (3) (b) 4. a., 165.68 (3) (b) 4. b., 165.68 (3) (b) 4. e. and 183.0105 (1) (intro.); and to create 165.68 (5) (e), 165.68 (5) (f) and 165.68 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: address confidentiality, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Address confidentiality, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:16 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab865 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB865.pdf |